Odpowiedzi

2009-11-25T22:37:29+01:00
359 X 96 = 34 464
256 x 13 = 3 328
378 x 11= 4 158
121 x 19= 2 299
123 x 4= 492
456 x 7= 3 192
789 x 2= 1 578
234 x 5= 1 170
567 x 8= 4 536
891 x 2= 1 782
2009-11-25T22:38:17+01:00
34464
3328
4158
2299
492
3192
1578
1170
4536
1782
2009-11-26T00:15:11+01:00
359 X 96 =34464
256 x 13 =3328
378 x 11=4158
121 x 19=2299
123 x 4=492
456 x 7=3192
789 x 2=1578
234 x 5=1170
567 x 8=4536
891 x 2=1782