Odpowiedzi

2010-02-07T15:05:56+01:00
A) 86×72×+86×23 = 86(72+23)=86x95= 8170
b) 36×58+(35)×57 = (35+1)58 + 35(58-1)= 35x58 + 58 + 35x58 - 35= 2x35x58 + 23=
70x58 + 23 = 4060 + 23 = 4083
c) (-3)×29,5+2×29,5 = (2 - 3)29,5 = -29,5
d) (-11)×17,2+(-11)×12,8 = -11(17,2 + 12,8) =-11x30=-330
2010-02-07T15:09:12+01:00
A)6192+1978=8170
b)2088+1995=4083
c)-88,5+59=-29,5
d)-189.2+(-140,8)=330